~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 3 2013 |
Application (12A963) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 15, 2013 to May 15, 2013, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Apr 9 2013 |
Application (12A963) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 15, 2013. |
May 15 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 17, 2013) |
Jun 7 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 16, 2013. |
Aug 16 2013 |
Brief of respondent Rita Harkins, Clerk, Superior Court of Georgia, Lumpkin County in opposition filed. |
Sep 3 2013 |
Reply of petitioner Sarah Jane Underwood filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 4 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 |
Petition DENIED. |