No. 12-1351 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 14, 2013 | |||
Linked with 12A931 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-17755) |
Decision Date: | January 10, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 28 2013 | Application (12A931) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 10, 2013 to June 9, 2013, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Apr 1 2013 | Application (12A931) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 10, 2013. |
May 10 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 13, 2013) |
May 30 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 15, 2013. |
Jun 10 2013 | Brief amicus curiae of DRI -The Voice of the Defense Bar filed. |
Jun 13 2013 | Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al filed. |
Jun 13 2013 | Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed. |
Jul 15 2013 | Brief of respondents Richard Stengel, and Mary Lou Stengel in opposition filed. |
Jul 30 2013 | Reply of petitioner Medtronic, Inc. filed. |
Jul 31 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
May 20 2014 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
May 30 2014 | Suggestion of death of respondent Richard Stengel filed by respondent Mary Lou Stengel. |
Jun 3 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 19, 2014. |
Jun 3 2014 | Response from petitioner Medtronic, Inc. to respondent's suggestion of death filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 3 2014 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Medtronic, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 23 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Miguel A. Estrada | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP | (202) 955-8500 |
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
mestrada@gibsondunn.com | ||
Party name: Medtronic, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Thomas G. Cotter | Haralson Miller Pitt Feldman & McAnally PLC | (520) 792-3836 |
Counsel of Record | One South Church Avenue | |
Suite 900 | ||
Tucson, AZ 85701 | ||
tcotter@hmpmlaw.com | ||
Party name: Richard Stengel, and Mary Lou Stengel | ||
Other: | ||
Alan Jay Lazarus | Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP | (415) 591-7500 |
50 Freemont Street, 20th Floor | ||
San Francisco, CA 94105 | ||
Alan.Lazarus@dbr.com | ||
Party name: Product LiabilityAdvisory Council, Inc. | ||
Mary Massaron Ross | President of DRI | (312) 795-1101 |
DRI- The Voice of the Defense Bar | ||
55 West Monroe | ||
Suite 2000 | ||
Chicago, IL 6063 | ||
mmassaron@plunkettcooney.com | ||
Party name: DRI -The Voice of the Defense Bar | ||
Richard A. Samp | Washington Legal Foundation | (202) 588-0302 |
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
rsamp@wlf.org | ||
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, et al | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |