~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 25 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2013) |
Apr 29 2013 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents. |
May 3 2013 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners Ed Ray and Mark McCambridge. |
May 23 2013 |
Waiver of right of respondents OSU Student Alliance, et al. to respond filed. |
May 29 2013 |
Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education, et al. filed. |
May 29 2013 |
Brief amici curiae of Washington State University, et al. filed. |
Jun 4 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 20, 2013. |
Jun 10 2013 |
Response Requested . (Due July 10, 2013) |
Jun 20 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 9, 2013. |
Aug 9 2013 |
Brief of respondents OSU Student Alliance, et al. in opposition filed. |
Aug 27 2013 |
Reply of petitioners Ed Ray, et al. filed. |
Aug 28 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 |
Petition DENIED. |