No. 12-1092 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 8, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-30249, 10-31054, 11-30808) |
Decision Date: | September 24, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 7, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 7 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2013) |
Mar 20 2013 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners. |
Apr 3 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 8, 2013. |
Apr 8 2013 | Brief amici curiae of State of Louisiana, et al. filed. |
Apr 8 2013 | Brief amici curiae of Professors of Law, and Public Interest Environmental Leaders filed. |
Apr 8 2013 | Brief amici curiae of Concerned Scientists, Engineers, and Academics filed. |
Apr 8 2013 | Brief amici curiae of Entergy New Orleans, Inc., et al. filed. |
Apr 8 2013 | Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. |
Apr 30 2013 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2013. |
May 24 2013 | Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jun 4 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 20, 2013. |
Jun 4 2013 | Reply of petitioners Kent Lattimore, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 24 2013 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
David C. Frederick | Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C. | (202) 326-7900 |
1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400 | ||
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
dfrederick@khhte.com | ||
Party name: Kent Lattimore, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States, et al. | ||
Other: | ||
James David Caldwell | Attorney General | (225) 326-6085 |
Louisiana Department of Justice | ||
1855 N. Third Street | ||
Baton Rouge, LA 70802 | ||
caldwellb@ag.state.la.us | ||
Party name: State of Louisiana, et al. | ||
Richard A. Derevan | Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P. | (714) 427-7000 |
600 Anton Blvd., Suite 1400 | ||
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 | ||
rderevan@swlaw.com | ||
Party name: Members of Congress | ||
Herb Fox | Law Office of Herb Fox | (805)-899-4777 |
15 West Carrillo Street, Suite 211 | ||
Santa Barbara, CA 93101 | ||
hfox@foxappeals.com | ||
Party name: Concerned Scientists, Engineers, and Academics | ||
Elisa T. Gilbert | The Gilbert Firm, PC | (212)-286-8503 |
325 East 57th Street | ||
New York, NY 10022 | ||
egilbert@gilbert-firm.com | ||
Party name: Entergy New Orleans, Inc., et al. | ||
Oliver Austin Houck | Tulane Law School | (504) 865-4946 |
6325 Freret Street | ||
New Orleans, LA 70118 | ||
ohouck@tulane.edu | ||
Party name: Professors of Law, and Public Interest Environmental Leaders |