~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 23 2011 |
Application (11A621) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 27, 2011 to February 10, 2012, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Dec 29 2011 |
Application (11A621) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 26, 2012. |
Jan 26 2012 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2012) |
Feb 28 2012 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 1, 2012. |
Apr 30 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 31, 2012. |
May 31 2012 |
Brief of respondent George Banks in opposition filed. |
May 31 2012 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent George Banks. |
Jun 13 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2012. |
Sep 20 2012 |
Reply of petitioner Pennsylvania filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 1 2012 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Oct 1 2012 |
Petition DENIED. |