No. 11-9083 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 5, 2012 | |||
Linked with 11A839 | ||||
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (WR-62,425-01, and WR-62,425-02) |
Decision Date: | February 29, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 5 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 4, 2012) |
Mar 5 2012 | Application (11A839) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Mar 6 2012 | Brief of respondent in opposition filed. |
Mar 6 2012 | Reply of petitioner Keith Thurmond filed. |
Mar 7 2012 | Application (11A839) referred to the Court. |
Mar 7 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
Mar 7 2012 | Application (11A839) denied by the Court. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
David R. Dow | University of Houston Law Center | (713) 743-2171 |
100 Law Center | ||
Houston, TX 77204-6060 | ||
ddow@uh.edu | ||
Party name: Keith Thurmond | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
W. Erich Dryden | Assistant Attorney General | (512) 936-1400 |
Office of the Attorney General of Texas | ||
Post Office Box 12548 | ||
Capitol Station | ||
Austin, TX 78711-2548 | ||
Party name: Texas |