No. 11-8728 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 10, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-10287) |
Decision Date: | November 7, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 6 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 12, 2012) |
Mar 7 2012 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 11, 2012. |
Apr 11 2012 | Brief of respondent United States filed. |
Apr 25 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 10, 2012. |
May 14 2012 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit for further consideration in light of the position asserted by the Solicitor General in his brief for the United States filed on April 11, 2012. |
Jun 15 2012 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Jerry V. Beard | Asst. Federal Public Defender | (214) 767-2746 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Federal Public Defender | |
Northern District of Texas | ||
525 Griffin Street, Suite 629 | ||
Dallas, TX 75202 | ||
jerry_beard@fd.org | ||
Party name: Franklin Garcia | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |