No. 11-6455
Title:
Demarcus McClarin, Petitioner
v.
Georgia
Docketed:September 19, 2011
Linked with 11A173
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Georgia
  Case Nos.:(S11A0493)
  Decision Date:April 18, 2011
  Rehearing Denied:May 16, 2011

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 2 2011 Application (11A173) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 14, 2011 to September 14, 2011, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Aug 10 2011 Application (11A173) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 14, 2011.
Sep 14 2011 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 19, 2011)
Sep 30 2011 Waiver of right of respondent Georgia to respond filed.
Oct 13 2011 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2011.
Oct 24 2011 Response Requested . (Due November 23, 2011)
Nov 22 2011 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2011.
Nov 30 2011 Brief of respondent Georgia in opposition filed.
Dec 15 2011 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2012.
Dec 15 2011 Reply of petitioner Demarcus McClarin filed.
Jan 9 2012 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Gerard Kleinrock DeKalb County Public Defender(404)-371-2222
Room 408 Callaway Buidling
120 West Trinity Place
Decatur, GA  30030
Party name: Demarcus McClarin
Attorneys for Respondent:
Paula K. Smith Senior Assistant Attorney General(404) 656-3351
    Counsel of RecordGeorgia Department of Law
40 Capitol Square, S. W.
Atlanta, GA  30334-1300
psmith@law.ga.gov
Party name: Georgia