~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 15 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 17, 2011) |
Sep 15 2011 |
Application (11A302) for a stay of execution pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Sep 19 2011 |
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Sep 19 2011 |
Reply of petitioner Cleve Foster filed. |
Sep 20 2011 |
Application (11A302) referred to the Court. |
Sep 20 2011 |
Application (11A302) granted by the Court pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the mandate of this Court. |
Mar 21 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 23, 2012. |
Mar 26 2012 |
Petition DENIED. |