No. 11-6382 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 15, 2011 | |||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Georgia |
Case Nos.: | (S11A0298) |
Decision Date: | May 16, 2011 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 13, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 12 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 17, 2011) |
Sep 12 2011 | Appendix of Christopher Eugene Brown filed. |
Sep 29 2011 | Waiver of right of respondent Georgia to respond filed. |
Oct 13 2011 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2011. |
Oct 31 2011 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Gerard Kleinrock | DeKalb County Public Defender | (404)-371-2222 |
Counsel of Record | Room 408 Callaway Buidling | |
120 West Trinity Place | ||
Decatur, GA 30030 | ||
Party name: Christopher Eugene Brown | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Paula K. Smith | Senior Assistant Attorney General | (404) 656-3351 |
Counsel of Record | Georgia Department of Law | |
40 Capitol Square, S. W. | ||
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300 | ||
psmith@law.ga.gov | ||
Party name: Georgia |