~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 4 2011 |
Application (10A995) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Apr 12 2011 |
Application (10A995) denied by Justice Kennedy. |
May 6 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 29, 2011) |
Jul 29 2011 |
Application (10A995) refiled and submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Aug 4 2011 |
Waiver of right of respondents United States, et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 11 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2011. |
Aug 24 2011 |
Application (10A995) referred to the Court. (Distributed) |
Sep 2 2011 |
Application (10A995) denied by the Court. |
Oct 3 2011 |
Petition DENIED. |