No. 11-5320 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 18, 2011 | |||
Linked with 11A73 | ||||
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (WR-62,298-02) |
Decision Date: | July 14, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 18 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 17, 2011) |
Jul 18 2011 | Application (11A73) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Jul 18 2011 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Jul 20 2011 | Reply of petitioner Mark Anthony Stroman filed. |
Jul 20 2011 | Application (11A73) referred to the Court. |
Jul 20 2011 | Application (11A73) denied by the Court. |
Jul 20 2011 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Lydia M.V. Brandt | The Brandt Law Firm, P.C. | (972) 699-7020 |
P.O. Box 850843 | ||
Richardson, TX 75085-0843 | ||
Party name: Mark Anthony Stroman | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
W. Erich Dryden | Assistant Attorney General | (512) 936-1400 |
Office of the Attorney General of Texas | ||
Post Office Box 12548 | ||
Capitol Station | ||
Austin, TX 78711-2548 | ||
Party name: Texas |