No. 11-5311 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 15, 2011 | |||
Linked with 11A72 | ||||
Lower Ct: | Superior Court of Arizona, Pima County |
Case Nos.: | (CR021715) |
Decision Date: | June 29, 2011 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | July 13, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 15 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 15, 2011) |
Jul 15 2011 | Application (11A72) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jul 18 2011 | Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed. |
Jul 18 2011 | Response to application from respondent Arizona filed. |
Jul 18 2011 | Reply of petitioner Thomas Paul West filed. |
Jul 19 2011 | Application (11A72) referred to the Court. |
Jul 19 2011 | Petition DENIED. |
Jul 19 2011 | Application (11A72) denied by the Court. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Timothy M. Gabrielsen | Assistant Federal Public Defender | (520) 879-7614 |
407 West Congress Street | ||
Suite 501 | ||
Tucson, AZ 85701-1310 | ||
tim_gabrielsen@fd.org | ||
Party name: Thomas Paul West | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Lacey Stover Gard | Assistant Attorney General | (520) 628-6520 |
Office of the Attorney General | ||
400 West Congress Street, S-315 | ||
Tucson, AZ 85701 | ||
Lacey.Gard@azag.gov | ||
Party name: Arizona |