No. 11-49 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 12, 2011 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (01-9014) |
Decision Date: | April 26, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 8 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 11, 2011) |
Jul 29 2011 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 12, 2011. |
Sep 9 2011 | Brief of respondent Mumia Abu-Jamal in opposition filed. |
Sep 21 2011 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2011. |
Sep 21 2011 | Reply of petitioners John E. Wetzel, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 11 2011 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Ronald Eisenberg | Deputy District Attorney | (215) 686-5700 |
District Attorney's Office | ||
Three South Penn Square | ||
Philadelphia, PA 19107-3499 | ||
ronald.eisenberg@phila.gov | ||
Party name: John E. Wetzel, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Christina Swarns | NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. | (212) 965-2200 |
99 Hudson Street | ||
Suite 1600 | ||
New York, NY 10013 | ||
Party name: Mumia Abu-Jamal |