No. 11-10967 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | June 21, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Virginia |
Case Nos.: | (110632) |
Decision Date: | January 13, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 9, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 7 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 23, 2012) |
Jul 20 2012 | Brief of respondent Virginia in opposition filed. |
Aug 2 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2012. |
Aug 2 2012 | Reply of petitioner Alfredo Rolando Prieto filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 1 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Ursula Bentele | Director | (718) 780-7990 |
Brooklyn Law School | ||
250 Joralemon Street | ||
Brooklyn, NY 11201 | ||
Ursula.bentele@brooklaw.edu | ||
Party name: Alfredo Rolando Prieto | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Matthew P. Dullaghan | Senior Assistant Attorney General | (804) 786-4073 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
900 East Main Street | ||
Richmond, VA 23219 | ||
mdullaghan@oag.state.va.us | ||
Party name: Virginia |