No. 11-1011 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 15, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-1198) |
Decision Date: | September 2, 2011 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 15, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 13 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2012) |
Feb 22 2012 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 16, 2012. |
Apr 16 2012 | Brief in opposition of respondent Reginald Walker filed. |
Apr 16 2012 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent. |
Apr 30 2012 | Reply of petitioner Carol R. Howes, Warden filed. (Distributed) |
May 1 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 17, 2012. |
May 21 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 24, 2012. |
May 29 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 31, 2012. |
Jun 4 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 7, 2012. |
Jun 11 2012 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Jun 11 2012 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Parker v. Matthews, 567 U. S. ___ (2012). |
Jul 13 2012 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
John J. Bursch | Michigan Solicitor General | (517) 373-1124 |
Counsel of Record | Michigan Department of Attorney General | |
P.O. Box 30212 | ||
Lansing, MI 48909 | ||
BurschJ@michigan.gov | ||
Party name: Carol R. Howes, Warden | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Jonathan Sacks | Deputy Director | (313) 256-9833 |
Counsel of Record | State Appellate Defender Office | |
Penobscot Building, Suite 3300 | ||
645 Griswold Street | ||
Detroit, MI 48226-4281 | ||
jsacks@sado.org | ||
Party name: Reginald Walker | ||
Other: | ||
Thomas B. Brunker | Assistant Attorney General | (801) 366-0180 |
Office of the Attorney General | ||
160 East 300 South, 6th Floor | ||
P.O. Box 140854 | ||
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-0854 | ||
tbrunker@utah.gov | ||
Party name: Utah, et al. |