No. 10-9514 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 16, 2011 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (WR-37,145-03) |
Decision Date: | December 15, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 12 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 15, 2011) |
Apr 19 2011 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 16, 2011. |
May 16 2011 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Jun 1 2011 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2011. |
Jun 20 2011 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Gregory W. Wiercioch | University of Wisconsin Law School | (608) 263-1388 |
975 Bascom Mall | ||
Madison, WI 53706 | ||
Party name: Scott Louis Panetti | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Tina J. Miranda | Office of the Attorney General | (512) 936-1400 |
Counsel of Record | Post Office Box 12548 | |
Austin, TX 78711-2548 | ||
Party name: Texas |