~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 4 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2011) |
Feb 23 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2011. |
Mar 3 2011 |
Response Requested . (Due April 4, 2011) |
Mar 25 2011 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 4, 2011. |
May 4 2011 |
Brief of respondent Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
May 16 2011 |
Reply of petitioner Rafael Arriaza Gonzalez filed. |
May 17 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2011. |
Jun 6 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2011. |
Jun 13 2011 |
Petition GRANTED limited to the following questions: 1. Was there jurisdiction to issue a certificate of appealability under 28 U. S. C. §2253(c) and to adjudicate petitioner’s appeal? 2. Was the application for a writ of habeas corpus out of time under 28 U. S. C. §2244(d)(1) due to “the date on which the judgment became final by the conclusion of direct review or the expiration of the time for seeking such review”?
. |
Jul 1 2011 |
The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 5, 2011. |
Jul 1 2011 |
The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 14, 2011. |
Aug 1 2011 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent. |
Aug 5 2011 |
Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
Aug 5 2011 |
Brief of petitioner Rafael Arriaza Gonzalez filed. |
Aug 8 2011 |
SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, November 2, 2011 |
Aug 10 2011 |
Record from U.S.C.A. for 5th Circuit is electronic. |
Aug 12 2011 |
Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and the Innocence Network filed. |
Aug 12 2011 |
Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. |
Aug 17 2011 |
Record received from U.S.D.c. for Northern District of Texas. (1 box) |
Aug 19 2011 |
CIRCULATED. |
Sep 14 2011 |
Brief of respondent Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 21 2011 |
Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 21 2011 |
Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. |
Oct 14 2011 |
Reply of petitioner Rafael Arriaza Gonzalez filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 17 2011 |
Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. |
Nov 2 2011 |
Argued. For petitioner: Patricia A. Millett, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Jonathan F. Mitchell, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.; and Ann O'Connell, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) |
Nov 3 2011 |
Letter from Counsel for the petitioner filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 10 2012 |
Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Sotomayor, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, Ginsburg, Breyer, Alito, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Scalia, J., filed a dissenting opinion. |
Feb 13 2012 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
Mar 2 2012 |
Record returned to U.D.C. for the Northern District of Texas. |