No. 10-8367 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | January 13, 2011 | |||
Linked with 10A698 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-10069) |
Decision Date: | January 11, 2011 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | January 4, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 13 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 14, 2011) |
Jan 13 2011 | Application (10A698) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jan 13 2011 | Brief of respondent Grantt Culliver, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jan 13 2011 | Order entered by Justice Thomas granting a stay of execution of sentence of death pending further order of Justice Thomas or of the Court. |
Jan 13 2011 | Application (10A698) referred to the Court. |
Jan 13 2011 | Petition DENIED. |
Jan 13 2011 | Application (10A698) denied by the Court. The order heretofore entered by Justice Thomas is vacated. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Bryan A. Stevenson | Equal Justice Initiative | (334) 269-1803 |
122 Commerce Street | ||
Montgomery, AL 36104 | ||
bstevenson@eji.org | ||
Party name: Leroy White | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
J. Clayton Crenshaw | Assistant Attorney General | (334) 353-2021 |
Office of the Attorney General | ||
501 Washington Avenue | ||
P.O. Box 300152 | ||
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152 | ||
CCRENSHAW@AGO.STATE.AL.US | ||
Party name: Grantt Culliver, Warden |