~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 26 2010 |
Application (10A439) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 22, 2010 to December 22, 2010, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Nov 5 2010 |
Application (10A439) granted by Justice Scalia extending the time to file until December 22, 2010. |
Dec 22 2010 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 27, 2011) |
Jan 20 2011 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 28, 2011. |
Feb 9 2011 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 30, 2011. |
Mar 28 2011 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 29, 2011. |
Apr 27 2011 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 23, 2011. |
May 19 2011 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 23, 2011. |
Jun 21 2011 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Jul 7 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2011. |
Sep 15 2011 |
Reply of petitioner Julius Omar Robinson, aka Face, aka Scar, aka Scarface filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 3 2011 |
Petition DENIED. |