~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 27 2010 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2011) |
Dec 28 2010 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 7, 2011. |
Jan 24 2011 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 9, 2011. |
Jan 25 2011 |
Waiver of right of respondents Richard Warren, Joseph Lowery to respond filed. |
Mar 9 2011 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 8, 2011. |
Apr 8 2011 |
Brief of respondent John G. Roberts, Jr., Chief Justice of the United States, et al. in opposition filed. |
Apr 19 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2011. |
Apr 19 2011 |
Reply of petitioners Michael Newdow, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
May 16 2011 |
Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |