~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 12 2010 |
Application (10A179) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 2, 2010 to October 18, 2010, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Aug 17 2010 |
Application (10A179) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 18, 2010. |
Oct 15 2010 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 18, 2010) |
Nov 16 2010 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 20, 2010. |
Dec 20 2010 |
Brief of respondent Richard F. Allen, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Dec 28 2010 |
Reply of petitioner Eddie D. Powell filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 30 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 14, 2011. |
Jan 18 2011 |
Petition DENIED. |