No. 10-7012 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 18, 2010 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (09-2965) |
Decision Date: | July 14, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 12 2010 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 17, 2010) |
Oct 25 2010 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Oct 28 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 12, 2010. |
Nov 15 2010 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Ira D London | Law Offices of London & Robin | (212) 683-8000 |
245 Fifth Avenue | ||
Suite 900 | ||
New York, NY 10016 | ||
Party name: Stephen M. Levy, aka Reallybad@aol.com, aka Steve Levy | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal | Acting Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ | ||
Party name: United States |