No. 10-5804 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 9, 2010 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (07-15478) |
Decision Date: | July 30, 2009 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 14, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 13 2010 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 8, 2010) |
Sep 8 2010 | Brief of respondents Richard F. Allen, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 17 2010 | Reply of petitioner Phillip D. Hallford filed. |
Sep 23 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 8, 2010. |
Oct 12 2010 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Andrew E. Kantra | Pepper Hamilton LLP | (215) 981-4000 |
300 Two Logan Square | ||
18th and Arch Streets | ||
Philadelphia, PA 19103 | ||
Party name: Phillip D. Hallford | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
J. Clayton Crenshaw | Assistant Attorney General | (334) 353-2021 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
501 Washington Avenue | ||
P.O. Box 300152 | ||
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152 | ||
CCRENSHAW@AGO.STATE.AL.US | ||
Party name: Richard F. Allen, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. |