No. 10-541 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 25, 2010 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (09-15418) |
Decision Date: | March 15, 2010 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 14, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 12 2010 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 24, 2010) |
Nov 24 2010 | Waiver of right of respondents Thomas D. MacDonald, et al. to respond filed. |
Dec 8 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 7, 2011. |
Dec 29 2010 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Orly Taitz filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 10 2011 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Orly Taitz | 29839 Santa Margarita Pkwy | (949) 683-5411 |
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 | ||
Party name: Orly Taitz | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal | Acting Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ | ||
Party name: Thomas D. MacDonald, et al. |