~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 17 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 21, 2011) |
Jun 21 2011 |
Application (10A1253) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jun 21 2011 |
Brief of respondent in opposition filed. |
Jun 21 2011 |
Response to application from respondent filed. |
Jun 28 2011 |
Reply of petitioner Richard Lynn Bible filed. |
Jun 28 2011 |
Reply of applicant Richard Lynn Bible filed. |
Jun 29 2011 |
Application (10A1253) referred to the Court. |
Jun 29 2011 |
Petition DENIED. |
Jun 29 2011 |
Application (10A1253) denied by the Court. |