No. 10-1107 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 10, 2011 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (08-99001) |
Decision Date: | August 20, 2010 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 28, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 26 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2011) |
Apr 11 2011 | Brief of respondent David S. Detrich in opposition filed. |
Apr 11 2011 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent. |
Apr 26 2011 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2011. |
May 16 2011 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
May 16 2011 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Cullen v. Pinholster, 563 U. S. ___ (2011). |
Jun 17 2011 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Kent E. Cattani | Division Chief Counsel | (602) 542-4686 |
Office of the Attorney General | ||
1275 West Washington | ||
Phoenix, AZ 85007-2997 | ||
kent.cattani@azag.gov | ||
Party name: Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Jennifer Bedier | Arizona Capital Representation Project | (520) 229-8550 |
Counsel of Record | 131 E. Broadway Blvd | |
Tucson, AZ 85701 | ||
Party name: David S. Detrich |