~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 14 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2011) |
Jun 14 2011 |
Application (10A1226) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Jun 15 2011 |
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Jun 15 2011 |
Application (10A1226) referred to the Court. |
Jun 15 2011 |
Reply of petitioner John Lezell Balentine filed. |
Jun 15 2011 |
Application (10A1226) granted by the Court. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Scalia and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the mandate of this Court. |
Mar 21 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 23, 2012. |
Mar 26 2012 |
Petition DENIED. |