No. 10-1068 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 28, 2011 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (09-5172-cv, 10-0992-cv) |
Decision Date: | September 7, 2010 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 23, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 22 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2011) |
Mar 23 2011 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 29, 2011. |
Apr 28 2011 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 20, 2011. |
May 20 2011 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
May 27 2011 | Reply of petitioners ACORN, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
May 31 2011 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2011. |
Jun 20 2011 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Jules L. Lobel | 666 Broadway | (212) 614-6475 |
Counsel of Record | 7th Floor | |
New York, NY 10012 | ||
Party name: ACORN, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |