~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 10 2011 |
Application (10A903) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 21, 2011 to April 20, 2011, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Mar 16 2011 |
Application (10A903) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 20, 2011. |
Apr 20 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 27, 2011) |
May 13 2011 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
May 24 2011 |
Reply of petitioner Timothy Russell filed. (Distributed) |
May 25 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2011. |
Jun 13 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2011. |
Jun 20 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2011. |
Jun 27 2011 |
Petition DENIED. |