No. 09-8461 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | January 7, 2010 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District |
Case Nos.: | (A115725) |
Decision Date: | April 27, 2009 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | August 12, 2009 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 2 2009 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 8, 2010) |
Jan 13 2010 | Waiver of right of respondent California to respond filed. |
Jan 28 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2010. |
Feb 1 2010 | Response Requested . (Due March 3, 2010) |
Feb 18 2010 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 2, 2010. |
Mar 17 2010 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Apr 1 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 16, 2010. |
May 17 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 20, 2010. |
May 24 2010 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Philip M. Brooks | 1442A Walnut Street | (510) 528-7996 |
#233 | ||
Berkeley, CA 94709 | ||
Party name: Scott Edgar Dyleski | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Laurence K. Sullivan | Supervising Deputy Attorney General | (415) 703-5500 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000 | ||
San Francisco, CA 94012-7004 | ||
Party name: California | ||
Glenn R. Pruden | Supervising Deputy Attorney General | (415) 703-5959 |
Attorney General's Office | ||
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000 | ||
San Francisco, CA 94102-7004 | ||
Glenn.Pruden@doj.ca.gov | ||
Party name: California |