No. 09-6586 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 21, 2009 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Indiana, Second District |
Case Nos.: | (48A02-0902-CV-00124) |
Decision Date: | June 17, 2009 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | August 19, 2009 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 10 2009 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 21, 2009) |
Oct 21 2009 | Waiver of right of respondent Stanley Knight, Superintendent, Pendleton Correctional Facility to respond filed. |
Oct 29 2009 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2009. |
Nov 16 2009 | The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Eric D. Smith | 112675 | |
WCU 5501 South 1100 West | ||
Westville, IN 46391 | ||
Party name: Eric D. Smith | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Gary Damon Secrest | Attorney General's Office | (317) 232-6315 |
Counsel of Record | 302 W. Washington St., Indiana Government Center South | |
Indianapolis, IN 46204 | ||
Party name: Stanley Knight, Superintendent, Pendleton Correctional Facility |