No. 09-604 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 19, 2009 | |||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S154847) |
Decision Date: | July 2, 2009 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 19, 2009 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 17 2009 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2009) |
Dec 16 2009 | Waiver of right of respondent California to respond filed. |
Jan 6 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2010. |
Jan 7 2010 | Response Requested . (Due February 8, 2010) |
Feb 4 2010 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Feb 11 2010 | Supplemental brief of respondent California filed. |
Mar 24 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 16, 2010. |
Apr 19 2010 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Douglas L. Rappaport | 260 California Street | (415)-989-7900 |
Suite 1002 | ||
San Francisco, CA 94111 | ||
admin@sfcrimlaw.com | ||
Party name: Vince Vinhtuong Nguyen | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Laurence K. Sullivan | Supervising Deputy Attorney General | (415) 703-5849 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000 | ||
San Francisco, CA 94012-7004 | ||
Party name: California |