No. 09-1274 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | April 22, 2010 | |||
Linked with 09A834 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (08-2807, 08-2813, 08-2894, 08-2895) |
Decision Date: | November 10, 2009 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 22, 2009 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 10 2010 | Application (09A834) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 22, 2010 to April 21, 2010, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Mar 11 2010 | Application (09A834) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 21, 2010. |
Apr 21 2010 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 24, 2010) |
May 21 2010 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 4, 2010. |
May 28 2010 | Brief of respondents Larry Crawford, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jun 7 2010 | Reply of petitioners Reginald Clemons, et al. filed. |
Jun 8 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 24, 2010. |
Jun 28 2010 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Matthew S. Hellman | Jenner & Block LLP | (202) 639-6000 |
1099 New York Ave., N.W. | ||
Suite 900 | ||
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
mhellman@jenner.com | ||
Party name: Reginald Clemons, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Stephen D. Hawke | Assistant Attorney General | (573) 751-3321 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Missouri Attorney General | |
P.O. Box 899 | ||
Jefferson City, MO 65102 | ||
steohen.hawke@ago.mo.ago | ||
Party name: Larry Crawford, et al. |