~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 4 2010 |
Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. |
Jun 17 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2010. |
Jun 28 2010 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner filed. (Distributed) |
Jul 9 2010 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner filed. (Distributed) (Second Supplemental) |
Oct 4 2010 |
Petition DENIED. |
Oct 13 2010 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Oct 27 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 12, 2010. |
Nov 15 2010 |
Rehearing DENIED. |