No. 09-11229 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | June 9, 2010 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (07-60732) |
Decision Date: | March 12, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 4 2010 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 9, 2010) |
Jun 29 2010 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 9, 2010. |
Aug 9 2010 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2010. |
Aug 23 2010 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Sep 2 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2010. |
Oct 4 2010 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Kathryn N. Nester | Federal Public Defender's Office | (601) 948-4284 |
200 South Lamar Street | ||
Suite 200-N | ||
Jackson, MS 39201 | ||
Party name: James Ford Seale | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal | Acting Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ | ||
Party name: United States |