No. 09-11051 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 27, 2010 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (09-13596) |
Decision Date: | December 18, 2009 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 23, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 14 2010 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 28, 2010) |
Jun 25 2010 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Henry Lee Peterson filed. |
Jul 8 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2010. |
Jul 15 2010 | Response Requested . (Due August 16, 2010) |
Aug 13 2010 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 15, 2010. |
Sep 10 2010 | Brief of respondents Walter A. McNeil, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 23 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 8, 2010. |
Oct 12 2010 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Holland v. Florida, 560 U.S. ___ (2010). |
Nov 15 2010 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Henry Lee Peterson | V11353 | |
I-1, 217U, Liberty Correctional Institution | ||
11064 N.W. Dempsey Barron Road | ||
Bristol, FL 32321-2261 | ||
Party name: Henry Lee Peterson | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Wesley Heidt | Office of the Attorney General | (386) 238-4990 |
Counsel of Record | 444 Seabreeze Blvd., Suite 500 | |
Daytona Beach, FL 32118 | ||
wesley.heidt@myfloridalegal.com | ||
Party name: Walter A. McNeil, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. | ||
Pamela J. Koller | Office of the Attorney General | (386) 238-4990 |
Counsel of Record | 444 Seabreeze Blvd., 5th Floor | |
Daytona Beach, FL 32118 | ||
pamela.koller@myfloridalegal.com | ||
Party name: Walter A. McNeil, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. |