~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 16 2008 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 21, 2009) |
Jan 21 2009 |
Waiver of right of respondent Allstate Insurance Company to respond filed. |
Jan 29 2009 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner David W. Peabody filed. |
Feb 5 2009 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2009. |
Feb 23 2009 |
The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. As the petitioner has repeatedly abused this Court's process, the Clerk is directed not to accept any further petitions in noncriminal matters from petitioner unless the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) is paid and the petition is submitted in compliance with Rule 33.1. See Martin v. District of Columbia Court of Appeals, 506 U.S. 1 (1992) (per curiam). Justice Stevens dissents. See id., at 4, and cases cited therein. |
Mar 5 2009 |
Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner. |
Mar 11 2009 |
Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2009. |
Mar 30 2009 |
Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED. |