No. 08-7603 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | December 8, 2008 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (08-15565) |
Decision Date: | November 14, 2008 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 2 2008 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 7, 2009) |
Dec 22 2008 | Waiver of right of respondents Craig Farwell, Warden, et al. to respond filed. |
Jan 8 2009 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 23, 2009. |
Jan 26 2009 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Michael A. Sakay | 64834 | |
1200 Prison Road | ||
Lovelock, NV 89419 | ||
Party name: Michael Sakay | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Julie A. Slabaugh | Office of the Attorney General | (775) 684-1131 |
Counsel of Record | Criminal Justice Division | |
100 North Carson Street | ||
Carson City, NV 89701 | ||
Party name: Craig Farwell, Warden, et al. |