No. 08-7229 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 13, 2008 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (06-99005) |
Decision Date: | August 14, 2008 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 10 2008 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 15, 2008) |
Dec 15 2008 | Brief of respondent Dora B. Schriro, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Dec 31 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 16, 2009. |
Jan 2 2009 | Reply of petitioner Daniel Wayne Cook filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 21 2009 | Petition DENIED. |
Apr 16 2012 | Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner. |
Apr 24 2012 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 10, 2012. |
May 14 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 17, 2012. |
May 21 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 24, 2012. |
May 29 2012 | Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Michael J. Meehan | Law Office of Micael Meehan | (520) 529-1969 |
3938 E. Grant Rd. | ||
No. 423 | ||
Tucson, AZ 85712 | ||
mmeehan.az@msn.com | ||
Party name: Daniel Wayne Cook | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Kent E. Cattani | Division Chief Counsel | (602) 542-4686 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
1275 West Washington | ||
Phoenix, AZ 85007-2997 | ||
kent.cattani@azag.gov | ||
Party name: Dora B. Schriro, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections | ||
Gregory G. Garre | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
Party name: Dora B. Schriro, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections |