No. 08-6622 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 6, 2008 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 3 2008 | Petition for a writ of mandamus and/or prohibition and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 5, 2008) |
Nov 20 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 5, 2008. |
Dec 8 2008 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Susan Herbert | 1100 Seagate Avenue 101 | (904) 705-6171 |
Neptune Beach, FL 32266 | ||
Party name: |