~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 16 2009 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 26, 2009) |
Jun 9 2009 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2009. |
Jun 17 2009 |
Response Requested . (Due July 17, 2009) |
Jul 17 2009 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 17, 2009. |
Aug 17 2009 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 16, 2009. |
Oct 8 2009 |
Brief of respondent Gatco, Inc., dba Folio Associates in opposition filed. |
Oct 21 2009 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2009. |
Mar 31 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 2, 2010. |
Apr 12 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 16, 2010. |
Apr 19 2010 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit for further consideration in light of Shady Grove Orthopedic Associates, P. A. v. Allstate Ins. Co., 559 U.S. ___ (2010). Justice Scalia filed a concurring opinion. Justice Ginsburg filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Breyer joins. Justice Sotomayor took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
May 21 2010 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |