No. 08-1198 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 27, 2009 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (06-3474) |
Decision Date: | November 4, 2008 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 12, 2009 |
Questions Presented |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 26 2009 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 27, 2009) |
Apr 20 2009 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 11, 2009. |
Apr 23 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Association of Ship Brokers & Agents (U.S.A.), Inc. filed. |
Apr 24 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Society of Maritime Arbitrators, Inc. filed. |
Apr 27 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. |
May 11 2009 | Brief of respondent AnimalFeeds International Corp. in opposition filed. |
May 26 2009 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 11, 2009. |
May 26 2009 | Reply of petitioners Stolt-Nielsen S.A., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 15 2009 | Petition GRANTED. |
Jul 6 2009 | The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 28, 2009. |
Jul 6 2009 | The time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 20, 2009. |
Aug 6 2009 | Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in suport of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners. |
Aug 12 2009 | Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent. |
Aug 28 2009 | Joint appendix filed. Statement of costs received. |
Aug 28 2009 | Brief of petitioners Stolt-Nielsen S.A., et al. filed. |
Sep 2 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. |
Sep 3 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed. |
Sep 4 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of DRI -The Voice of the Defense Bar filed. |
Sep 4 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of CTIA - Wireless Association filed. |
Sep 4 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. |
Sep 4 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of American Arbitration Association filed. |
Sep 4 2009 | Brief amici curiae of Association of Ship Brokers and Agents, et al. filed. |
Sep 28 2009 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, December 9, 2009. |
Sep 29 2009 | CIRCULATED |
Oct 20 2009 | Brief of respondent AnimalFeeds International Corp. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 22 2009 | Record received from the U.S.C.A. for the 2nd Circuit. ((1 box) |
Oct 22 2009 | Record received from the U.S.D.C. for Southern District of New York. (1 box) |
Oct 27 2009 | Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 27 2009 | Brief amici curiae of Public Justice, and Public Good filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 27 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 27 2009 | Brief amici curiae of American Association for Justice, and AARP filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 27 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Dub Herring Ford Lincoln-Mercury, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 27 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of American Antitrust Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 19 2009 | Reply of petitioners Stolt-Nielsen S.A., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 9 2009 | Argued. For petitioners: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D.C. For respondent: Cornelia T. L. Pillard, Washington, D.C. |
Apr 27 2010 | Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Kennedy, and Thomas, JJ., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion in which Stevens and Breyer, JJ., joined. Sotomayor, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case. |
Jun 1 2010 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
Jun 4 2010 | Records returned to the USCA for the Second Circuit. (1-box) |
Jun 4 2010 | Records returned to the USDC for the Southern District of New York. (1-box) |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Seth P. Waxman | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP | (202) 663-6000 |
Counsel of Record | 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com | ||
Party name: Stolt-Nielsen S.A., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Cornelia T.L. Pillard | Georgetown University Law Center | (202) 662-9391 |
Counsel of Record | 600 New Jersey Ave., NW | |
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
pillardn@law.georgetown.edu | ||
Party name: AnimalFeeds International Corp. | ||
Bernard Persky | Labaton Sucharow LLP | (212) 907-0868 |
140 Broadway | ||
New York, NY 10005 | ||
Party name: AnimalFeeds International Corp. | ||
Other: | ||
F. Paul Bland Jr. | Public Justice, P.C. | (202) 797-8600 |
1825 K Street, N.W., Suite 200 | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
pbland@publicjustice.net | ||
Party name: Public Justice, and Public Good | ||
Raymond A. Connell | Law Office of Raymond A. Connell | (212) 233-0440 |
132 Nassau Street, Suite 900 | ||
New York, NY 10038 | ||
Party name: Society of Maritime Arbitrators, Inc. | ||
Sarah C. Crawford | National Partnership for Women & Families | (202) 986-2600 |
1875 Connecticut Ave., N.W., Suite 650 | ||
Washington, DC 20009 | ||
scrawford@nationalpartnership.org | ||
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil rights under Law, et al. | ||
Richard D. Faulkner | Blume, Faulkner, Skeen and Northam, PLLC | (214)-373-7788 |
111 W. Spring Valley Road | ||
Suite 250 | ||
Richardson, TX 75801 | ||
rfaulkner@blumefaulknerskeen.com | ||
Party name: Dub Herring Ford Lincoln-Mercury, Inc. | ||
Jerrold J. Ganzfried | Holland & Knight LLP | (202) 469-5151 |
2099 Pennsylvania Ave. NW | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
jerry.ganzfried@hklaw.com | ||
Party name: DRI -The Voice of the Defense Bar | ||
Dan. E. Gustafson | 650 Northstar East | (612) 333-8844 |
608 Second Avenue South | ||
Minneapolis, MN 55402 | ||
Party name: American Antitrust Institute, et al. | ||
William J. Honan | Holland & Knight LLP | (212) 513-3200 |
195 Broadway | ||
New York, NY 10007 | ||
bill.honan@hklaw.com | ||
Party name: Association of Ship Brokers and Agents | ||
Patrick V Martin | Law Office of Patrick V. Martin | (908) 233-7167 |
943 Lamberts Mill Rd. | ||
Westfield, NJ 07090 | ||
Party name: Association of Ship Brokers & Agents (U.S.A.), Inc. | ||
Scott L. Nelson | Public Citizen Litigation Group | (202) 588-1000 |
1600 20th Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20009 | ||
snelson@citizen.org | ||
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc. | ||
Carter G. Phillips | Sidley Austin LLP | (202) 736-8270 |
1501 K Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
cphillips@sidley.com | ||
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America | ||
Timothy M. Sandefur | Pacific Legal Foundation | (916) 419-7111 |
950 G Street | ||
Sacramento, CA 95814 | ||
tsandefur@pacificlegal.org | ||
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation | ||
Evan M. Tager | Mayer Brown LLP | (202) 263-3000 |
1999 K Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
etager@mayerbrown.com | ||
Party name: CTA - Wireless Association | ||
Eric P. Tuchmann | American Arbitration Association | (212) 716-3937 |
1633 Broadway, 10th Floor | ||
New York, NY 10019 | ||
TuchmannE@adr.org | ||
Party name: American Arbitration Association | ||
Rae T. Vann | Norris Tysse Lampley & Lakis LLP | (202) 629-5600 |
1501 M Street, N.W., Suite 400 | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
rvann@ntll.com | ||
Party name: Equal Employment Advisory Council | ||
Jeffrey R. White | Center for Constitutional Litigation PC | (202) 944-2839 |
777 6th Street, N.W., Suite 520 | ||
Washington, DC 20001-3723 | ||
jeffrey.white@cclfirm.com | ||
Party name: American Association for Justice, and AARP |