No. 07-9804 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 12, 2008 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 11 2008 | Petition for a writ of mandamus and/or prohibition and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2008) |
Apr 1 2008 | Waiver of right of respondent Federal Respondent to respond filed. |
Apr 3 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 18, 2008. |
Apr 21 2008 | Petition DENIED. |
May 7 2008 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
May 13 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 29, 2008. |
Jun 2 2008 | Rehearing DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Susan Herbert | 1100 Seagate Avenue 101 | (904) 705-6171 |
Neptune Beach, FL 32266 | ||
Party name: | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Paul D. Clement | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Federal Respondent |