No. 07-480 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 11, 2007 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (06-2238) |
Decision Date: | May 30, 2007 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 18, 2007 |
Questions Presented |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 4 2007 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2007) |
Nov 9 2007 | Brief of respondent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Nov 16 2007 | Reply of petitioner Pam Huber filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 20 2007 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 7, 2007. |
Dec 7 2007 | Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
Jan 11 2008 | Stipulation to dismiss the writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
Jan 14 2008 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
C. Brian Meadors | Pryor, Robertson Beasley, Smith & Karber, PLLC | (479) 782-8813 |
Counsel of Record | 315 North 7th Street | |
P.O. Drawer 848 | ||
Fort Smith, AR 72902-0848 | ||
cbmeadors@prbsklaw.com | ||
Party name: Pam Huber | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
James F. Bennett | Dowd Bennett LLP | (314) 889-7300 |
Counsel of Record | 7733 Forsyth Boulevard | |
Suite 1410 | ||
St. Louis, MO 63105 | ||
jbennett@dowdbennett.com | ||
Party name: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. |