No. 06-578 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 26, 2006 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (05-4651) |
Decision Date: | May 5, 2006 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 25, 2006 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 23 2006 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2006) |
Oct 31 2006 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Nov 7 2006 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 21, 2006. |
Nov 27 2006 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Clarke F. Ahlers | Atholton Square | (410) 740-1444 |
10450 Shaker Drive | ||
Suite 111 | ||
Columbia, MD 21046 | ||
Party name: Mahendra Shah, aka Mike Shah | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Paul D. Clement | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |