~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 26 2006 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 31, 2006) |
Aug 10 2006 |
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Aug 17 2006 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2006. |
Sep 14 2006 |
Response Requested . (Due October 16, 2006) |
Sep 29 2006 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Oct 11 2006 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 27, 2006. |
Oct 24 2006 |
Reply of petitioner Mario Claiborne filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 30 2006 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 3, 2006. |
Nov 3 2006 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to the following Questions: 1) Was the district court's choice of below-Guidelines sentence reasonable? 2) In making that determination, is it consistent with United States v. Booker, 543 U. S. 220 (2005), to require that a sentence which constitutes a substantial variance from the Guidelines be justified by extraordinary circumstances? |
Dec 6 2006 |
Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner |
Dec 7 2006 |
Motion to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal. filed by petitioner Mario Claiborne. |
Dec 18 2006 |
SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 20, 2007. |
Dec 18 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED. |
Dec 18 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Families Against Mandatory Minimums filed. VIDED. |
Dec 18 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of The Sentening Project, et al. filed. |
Dec 18 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed. |
Dec 18 2006 |
Brief of petitioner Mario Claiborne filed. |
Dec 18 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Who Study Sentencing Reform filed. VIDED. |
Dec 18 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED. |
Dec 18 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Federal Public and Community Defenders, et al. filed. VIDED. |
Dec 18 2006 |
Joint appendix Volume I filed. |
Dec 20 2006 |
Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 5, 2007. |
Jan 5 2007 |
Motion to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal. GRANTED. |
Jan 10 2007 |
CIRCULATED. |
Jan 19 2007 |
Record received from U.S.C.A. for Eighth Circuit. |
Jan 22 2007 |
Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed), |
Jan 22 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of United States Sentencing Commission filed. VIDED. (Distributed) |
Jan 22 2007 |
Brief amici curiae of Senators Edward M. Kennedy, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 10 2007 |
Record received from U.S.D.C. for the Eastern District of Missouri. (1 box)
There are sealed documents in this record. |
Feb 12 2007 |
Reply of petitioner Mario Claiborne filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 20 2007 |
Argued. For petitioner: Michael Dwyer, Assistant Federal Public Defender, St. Louis, Mo. For respondent: Michael R. Dreeben, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. |
May 31 2007 |
Motion for Disposition of Case filed by petitioner Mario Claiborne. (Distributed) |
Jun 1 2007 |
Response to motion for disposition of case filed by respondent United States. (Distributed) |
Jun 4 2007 |
Vacated as moot. Opinion per curiam. |
Jun 22 2007 |
Record returned to U.S.C.A. for Eighth Circuit. |
Jun 22 2007 |
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for the Eastern District of Missouri. |
Jul 6 2007 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
Jul 20 2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt (07/12/07) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit received. |