No. 05-10978 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 17, 2006 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (04-3788) |
Decision Date: | December 16, 2005 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 1, 2006 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 10 2006 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 16, 2006) |
Jun 15 2006 | Waiver of right of respondents Michael O. Leavitt, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. to respond filed. |
Jun 15 2006 | Brief of respondent HealthPartners, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Jun 29 2006 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2006. |
Oct 2 2006 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Peggy J. Anderson | 4129 West 45th Street | (952) 926-5593 |
Edina, MN 55424 | ||
Party name: Peggy Anderson | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Gregory Merz | Gray, Plant, Mooty, Motty & Bennett, P. A. | (612) 632-3000 |
Counsel of Record | 500 IDS Center | |
80 South Eight Street | ||
Minneapolis, MN 55402 | ||
Party name: HealthPartners, Inc. | ||
Paul D. Clement | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Michael O. Leavitt, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. |