No. 03M64 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 23, 2004 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (03-56581) |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 22 2004 | Motion of petitioner to direct the Clerk to file a petition for a writ of certiorari out-of-time filed. |
Mar 24 2004 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 16, 2004. |
Apr 19 2004 | Motion Denied. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Brandita A. Taliano | #W-68729 | |
Counsel of Record | P.O. Box 1508 | |
Chowchilla, CA 93610-1508 | ||
Party name: Brandita A. Taliano |