No. 03-661 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 4, 2003 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (01-1385) |
Decision Date: | August 6, 2003 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 23 2003 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2003) |
Dec 4 2003 | Brief of respondent Mary T. Keenan in opposition filed. |
Dec 17 2003 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2004. |
Jan 12 2004 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Darnay Hoffman | 210 West 70th Street | (212) 712-2766 |
Counsel of Record | New York, NY 10023 | |
Party name: Linda Hoffmann-Pugh | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
William Fraser Nagel | Assistant District Attorney | (303) 441-3190 |
Counsel of Record | P.O. Box 471 | |
Boulder, CO 80306 | ||
Party name: Mary T. Keenan |